Show Results For
-
All HBS Web
(4,068)
- People (6)
- News (1,553)
- Research (1,425)
- Events (25)
- Multimedia (161)
- Faculty Publications (963)
Show Results For
-
All HBS Web
(4,068)
- People (6)
- News (1,553)
- Research (1,425)
- Events (25)
- Multimedia (161)
- Faculty Publications (963)
- 05 Sep 2023
- News
HBS Names Rupal Gadhia New Head of MBA Admissions and Financial Aid
- July 2012 (Revised April 2013)
- Case
Peter Jepsen
- 04 Sep 2001
- Research & Ideas
Governing the Family-Run Business
- January 2014 (Revised January 2014)
- Case
Showdown at Cracker Barrel
- May 2017 (Revised March 2018)
- Case
Predicting Consumer Tastes with Big Data at Gap
John D. Dionne
John D. Dionne has been a Senior Lecturer of Business Administration at the Harvard Business School since 2014 and is a recently retired Senior Managing Director and Senior Advisor to Blackstone. He is also Managing Partner of Franconia Capital, a... View Details
- December 2016 (Revised April 2024)
- Case
Rajat Gupta
- July 2016 (Revised January 2019)
- Case
Cyber Breach at Target
- Blog
What Can You Do to Foster Gender Equity?
- Person Page
Former Boards
-Board of Directors of Eaton Corp.
-Board of Directors of Harvard Business Publishing
View Details
- Jan 29 2024
- Testimonial
Driving Positive Change on Corporate Boards
- 2013
- Working Paper
Accountability of Independent Directors—Evidence from Firms Subject to Securities Litigation
- September 2018 (Revised November 2018)
- Case
From Beirut With Love (A)
- 17 Jul 2023
- Blog Post
Sustainability Career Advice from the Career & Professional Development Office
Andy Zelleke
Andy Zelleke is the MBA Class of 1962 Senior Lecturer of Business Administration. A member of the General Management unit, he is the Faculty Chair of HBS’ Middle East & North Africa Research Center.
Since Spring 2021, Dr. Zelleke has taught “Unpacking... View Details
- May 2014 (Revised November 2014)
- Case
Houston We Have A Problem: NASA and Open Innovation (A)
Archie L. Jones
Archie Jones is Senior Lecturer at the Harvard Business School with an appointment in both the Finance and Entrepreneurial Management Units. In addition to teaching required curriculum courses in both units, Archie is a co-founder and course head for an elective... View Details
Howard H. Stevenson
Howard H. Stevenson is Sarofim-Rock Baker Foundation Professor emeritus, former Senior Associate Dean, Director of Publishing, and Chair of the Harvard Business Publishing Company board. The Sarofim-Rock Chair was established in 1982 to provide a continuing base for... View Details
- 30 Aug 2023
- News
Harvard Business School Announces 2023 Goldsmith Fellows
Srikant M. Datar
Srikant M. Datar became the eleventh dean of Harvard Business School on 1 January 2021. During his tenure as a faculty member, he served as Senior Associate Dean for University Affairs (including Faculty Chair of the Harvard Innovation Lab), for Research, for... View Details