Filter Results
:
(481)
Show Results For
-
All HBS Web
(1,173)
- People (3)
- News (481)
- Research (416)
- Multimedia (16)
- Faculty Publications (244)
Show Results For
-
All HBS Web
(1,173)
- People (3)
- News (481)
- Research (416)
- Multimedia (16)
- Faculty Publications (244)
Sort by
- 01 Jun 2012
- News
FAQ
in the sample budget below, students contribute an amount that HBS calculates by taking into account their prior years’ salary and spouse’s salary, if married, as well as their personal assets, including real estate, investments, and View Details
- 01 Dec 2016
- News
In Memoriam: F. Gorham Brigham Jr.
to colonel under General George C. Marshall and remaining in the Army Reserve until 1967. His banking career began in 1962, when he joined the Boston Safe Deposit and Trust Company as VP of business development. When he retired from...
View Details
Keywords:
Julia Hanna
- 01 Jun 2005
- News
Change of Pace
Having retired from Congress after representing his western New York district for eighteen years, Amory Houghton Jr. (MBA ’52) is now working as a volunteer with his old friend, Bishop Thomas Shaw, head of the Episcopal Diocese of...
View Details
- 01 Jun 2014
- News
@Soldiers Field
linebacker Isaiah Kacyvenski (MBA 2011) joined the likes of Colts QB Andrew Luck and retired US women's soccer standout Kristine Lilly Heavey for a panel discussion on how tech can improve—and preserve—athletes' careers. Magician and...
View Details
- 01 Jun 2013
- News
Notes from W50
negotiation tactics and responsible investing. Keynote speakers included Karen Gordon Mills (MBA 1977), administrator of the US Small Business Administration; Ann Moore (MBA 1978), retired chairman and CEO of Time Inc.; and Sheryl...
View Details
- 01 Mar 2006
- News
In Memoriam
HBS professor J. Keith Butters, an authority on finance and taxation, died in Lexington, Massachusetts, in December. He was 90. The Thomas D. Casserly Jr. Professor of Business Administration, Emeritus, Butters retired from the HBS...
View Details
- 01 Jun 2013
- News
Francis J. Aguilar, 1932-2013
teacher, and a kind and caring person," said Dean Nitin Nohria. Aguilar, who was also involved in several HBS international education programs, continued to teach in retirement at the Harvard Extension School, most notably a popular...
View Details
Keywords:
obituary
- 24 Apr 2014
- News
From a ‘blank slate’ to ‘Mr. China’
hiring more than 50 “New China” managers, Perkowski grew his company into $500 million ASIMCO Technologies, twice named one of the Best Employers in China. Known by the moniker “Mr. China,” Perkowski retired from ASIMCO in 2009 and...
View Details
- 01 Dec 2009
- News
Professor Barnes Remembered
Executive Education programs until his retirement from the active faculty in 1998. He also worked to improve classroom instruction at HBS and throughout Harvard. His HBS colleague, Senior Lecturer John Davis, recalled him as a...
View Details
- 19 May 2022
- News
Leading to Salvation
to apply to HBS, launching a career that would include executive roles at McKinsey, Citibank, and Union Texas Petroleum, as well as board service for General Mills, Hewlett-Packard, Stanley Black & Decker, and UnitedHealth. From 1993 until his View Details
- 01 Jan 2004
- News
Donald P. Nielsen, MBA 1963
saw in his company's entry-level hires. When he retired in 1992, he decided to do something about it by running for the Seattle school board. "If you want to change public education," he says, "you have to get inside the system." When he...
View Details
- 08 Mar 2019
- News
A Passionate Patron and Collector
The New York Times recently profiled art collector Reginald Van Lee (MBA 1984), discussing some of his collection with him in his Manhattan apartment. Van Lee, who retired from Booz Allen Hamilton in 2016, has a number of pieces adorning...
View Details
- 22 Oct 2018
- News
Sharing a Passion for Art
216-metric-ton steel sculpture by American artist Richard Serra. When he retired in 2006, passing Caldic’s leadership to his son Olav (AMP 169, 2005), van Caldenborgh had several thousand pieces in his collection. Since 2016, some of...
View Details
- 15 Sep 2016
- News
Leading the Way
Jim McNerney (MBA 1975) is the retired chairman of the Boeing Company and is a 2016 recipient of an HBS Alumni Achievement Award. In this video he discusses his experience as a leader of two of America’s top companies and the lessons he...
View Details
- 01 Jun 2009
- News
Martin V. Marshall Remembered
retired from the active faculty in 1993, was a marketing and advertising expert whose practice-oriented approach to teaching and course development left a lasting impact on countless Harvard MBA students and business leaders. “Marty was a...
View Details
- 01 Jun 1999
- News
Where Main Street Meets Wall Street
mutual funds as a means to build their retirement nest eggs. A snapshot of some industry numbers reveals that in 1964, mutual fund assets totaled $28 billion; by 1980, they had grown to some $150 billion. But by 1992, assets had soared to...
View Details
Keywords:
Garry Emmons
- 01 Mar 2013
- News
Thomas K. McCraw, 1940–2012
phrase 'a scholar and a gentleman,'" said Dean Nitin Nohria. McCraw, who retired from the active faculty in 2006, came to HBS in 1976. A protégé of the late HBS professor Albert Chandler, he led the effort to develop the required MBA...
View Details
Keywords:
obituary
- 01 Mar 2016
- News
Credit, Decoded
means for their bus[iness], are steady, indust[rious] & good bus[iness]men, stand v[er]y high here, & Consid[ere]d g[oo]d & safe. June 22 /66 All right wor[th] over 100$m [$100,000]. July 16 /68 A. is in France, are wealthy & Retired from...
View Details
- 01 Jan 2010
- News
Marvin S. Traub, MBA 1949
careers of many of the designers that are today’s most popular brands: Ralph Lauren, Calvin Klein, and Donna Karan, among them. At the same time, he mentored dozens of employees who went on to lead major stores and brands. After retiring...
View Details
- 12 Feb 2020
- News
Culture Shift at Big Blue
Getty Images Getty Images With the news of President and CEO Ginni Rometty’s retirement and the elevation of Arvind Krishna to replace her as chief executive, IBM simultaneously announced that Jim Whitehurst (MBA 1994) will step up as the...
View Details